Coates, Geoffrey (CPSO#: 20618)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014