Coates, Janice Margaret (CPSO#: 33834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 Romeo Street South #506
Stratford ON  N5A 4S9
Phone: (519) 301-0511
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE MARGARET COATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COATES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1982