Coates, John Robert George (CPSO#: 67977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Family Health Team
Jackson Park Health Centre
Suite 245
2475 McDougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 250-5656
Fax: (519) 250-5864
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT GEORGE COATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COATES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1996