Cobourn, Christopher Stanley (CPSO#: 52668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Queensway West
Suite 201
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 276-7211
Fax: (905) 276-6486
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1413 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 278-8000
Fax: (905) 275-1582
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.S. Cobourn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cobourn ( CPSO# 52668 )

Business Address:
1413 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-8000

Business Address:
201 - 170 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 276-7211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STANLEY COBOURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COBOURN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1985

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)