Cochen, Douglas Andrew (CPSO#: 66709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 274-7282
Fax: (613) 274-2970
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Honey & Cochen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Honey ( CPSO# 68239 )
Dr. D. Cochen ( CPSO# 66709 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 274-7282

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ANDREW COCHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993