Cochrane, Colin Tadashi (CPSO#: 97751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Lake Health Centre
11 Lakeside Terrace
2nd floor, Suite 201
Barrie, Ontario
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-881-9810
Fax: (705) 9153500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. C. Cochrane and S. Comstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cochrane ( CPSO# 97751 )
Dr. S. Comstock ( CPSO# 98155 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
201 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 881-9810

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN TADASHI COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015