Cochrane, David Douglas (CPSO#: 43337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DOUGLAS COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2015