Cochrane, David Kenneth (CPSO#: 59630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 3639
Fax: (705) 495-7945
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cochrane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cochrane ( CPSO# 59630 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989