Coe, Emma Katherine (CPSO#: 98408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dorchester House
1353 Dorchester Avenue
Boston MA  02122
United States
Phone: (617) 288-3230

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA KATHERINE COE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014