Coelho, Ryan Martin (CPSO#: 92180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Delhi Community Health Centre
Family Health Team
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NGH
365 West Street
Simcoe, Ontario
N3Y 1T8
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Coelho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Coelho ( CPSO# 92180 )

Business Address:
Delhi Community Health Centre
Family Health Team
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN MARTIN COELHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COELHO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011