Cogan, Samantha Jill (CPSO#: 70148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1436 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3A9
Phone: (416) 240-1382
Fax: (416) 240-1103
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sommer Cogan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sommer ( CPSO# 69231 )
Dr. S. Cogan ( CPSO# 70148 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1436 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 240-1382

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 351-3700

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
3V1 Clinic E N T
1200 Main Street West
Rosseau ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University (Hamilton General Hospital)
237 Barton Street East
3 - Upper E N T Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JILL COGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998