Coghlan, Raymond Anthony (CPSO#: 33095)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001