Cogliano, Antonio (CPSO#: 66812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Fowler-Kennedy
Sport Medicine Clinic
TD Stadium Site UWO Mustangs
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Fax: (519) 661-3379
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kugluktuk Health Centre
Community Locum Support Physician
Kugluktuk NU  X0B 0E0
Canada
Phone: (867) 982-4531
Fax: (867) 982-3115
County: 
Electoral District: 

Alexandra Hospital ER
29 Noxon Street Ingersoll ON
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: (519) 485-9600
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Antonio Cogliano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cogliano ( CPSO# 66812 )

Business Address:
Fowler-Kennedy Sports
Medicine Clinic, 3M Centre
The Sport Medicine and Kinesiology
Pavilion, Univ of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3011

Business Address:
Alexandra Hospital - Emergency Room
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO COGLIANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COGLIANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995