Cohen, Charles Ian (CPSO#: 55782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MacIntosh Sport Medical Clinic
100 Devonshire Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: (416) 971-2846
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Canada
Phone: (416) 386-9761
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cohen ( CPSO# 55782 )

Business Address:
Toronto Memory Program
400 - 1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Business Address:
MacIntosh Sport Medical Clinic
100 Devonshire Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Phone Number: (416) 978-4678


Corporation Name: Dr. Sharon Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cohen ( CPSO# 55782 )
Dr. S. Cohen ( CPSO# 58734 )

Business Address:
Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES IAN COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986