Cohen, Dana Rachel (CPSO#: 77919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
2200 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: (416) 849-2250
Fax: (416) 849-2252
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana R. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cohen ( CPSO# 77919 )

Business Address:
2200 Rutherford Road
Suite 7
Concord ON  L4K 5V2
Phone Number: (416) 849-2250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA RACHEL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007