Cohen, David Robert (CPSO#: 58344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Macbeath Ave
Moncton NB  E1C 6Z8
Phone: (506) 857-5258

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988