Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cohen, Deborah Ruth (CPSO#: 54568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3550 Cote des Neiges
Suite 700
Montreal QC  H3H 1V4
Phone: (514) 933-8877
Fax: (514) 933-8338

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH RUTH COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985