Cohen, Elliott Saul (CPSO#: 32870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1105 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G5
Phone: (613) 729-1997
Fax: (613) 729-3017
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Saskatchewan
USA - New York
USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLIOTT SAUL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 May 2012
Summary:

On May 18, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Elliott Saul Cohen committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction 
other than Ontario has found that the member committed an act of professional misconduct that 
would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of misconduct as defined in the regulations. Dr. 
Cohen admitted the allegation.  
 
Dr. Cohen is an obstetrician/gynaecologist who practises part-time in Ottawa and has a primary 
practice in New York State with a license limited to the medically under serviced area of 
Watertown. 
 
On August 15, 2008, the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct found that 
between approximately February 2005 and March 2007, Dr. Cohen prescribed certain 
non-controlled prescription drugs to customers of a pharmacy for a fee. He reviewed online 
requests from approximately 400 members of the general nationwide public.  
 
The New York State Board found that Dr. Cohen's issuance of prescriptions to online patients did 
not meet the minimally accepted standard of care in that he failed to:  have a sufficient 
physician-patient relationship with the patients; take a history and perform examinations; 
formulate a reasonable diagnosis; and maintain adequate medical records. The Board also found 
that Dr. Cohen acted with negligence in that he failed to issue the prescriptions in good faith, his 
records were inadequate and that he violated the spirit of his limited license. It was noted that the 
drugs involved were drugs that did not have a high abuse potential but rather had safety profiles 
similar to many over the counter drugs.  
 
The New York State Board reprimanded Dr. Cohen and ordered a fine of $10,000. Upon a 
request for review, the Administrative Review Board added a three year suspension, which was 
stayed except for three months, and a fine was set at $30,000.  
 
Therefore, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
1.    the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of 
registration of Dr. Cohen: 
a)    Dr. Elliott Saul Cohen must successfully complete, at his own expense, 
College-facilitated instruction in Ethics.   
2.    Dr. Cohen attend before this panel to be reprimanded.  
3.    Dr. Cohen pay costs to the College in the amount of $3650.00 within 60 days of the date 
of this order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 18, 2012