Cohen, Eric Alan (CPSO#: 54737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite D-375
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5880
Fax: (416) 480-5827
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Huron Street, Suite 201
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cohen ( CPSO# 54737 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite D-375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 480-5880

Business Address:
Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 444-1648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC ALAN COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984