Cohen, Ezra Wyssam (CPSO#: 62607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3855 Health Sciences Drive
La Jolla CA  92093
United States
Phone: (858) 534-6161

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EZRA WYSSAM COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 1998 to 08 Apr 1998
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991