Cohen, Gloria Carol (CPSO#: 55321)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2004