Cohen, Hart Chaim Menachem (CPSO#: 52502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8635 West Third Street
Suite 450W
Los Angeles CA  90048
United States
Phone: (310) 652-5954
Fax: (310) 652-7570

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HART CHAIM MENACHEM COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988