Cohen, Howard Ronald (CPSO#: 50270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M4-146
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5217
Fax: (416) 480-4164
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard R. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cohen ( CPSO# 50270 )

Business Address:
Suite M4-146
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5217

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD RONALD COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983