Cohen, Irene (CPSO#: 57913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Services Western University
University Community Centre
Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irene Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cohen ( CPSO# 57913 )

Business Address:
University Community Centre
Western University Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990