Cohen, Matthew Howard (CPSO#: 60271)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1988 to 21 Sep 1988
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1996