Cohen, Max Mark (CPSO#: 31949)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009