Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cohen, Miles (CPSO#: 53909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1703
2 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J3
Phone: (416) 593-0233
Fax: (416) 593-9336
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILES COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985