Cohen, Paul David (CPSO#: 69069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 487-3453
Fax: (416) 487-5528
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5963
Fax: (416) 350-5927
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

150 York Street 15th Floor
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

140 Grand Cypress Lane
Collingwood ON  L9Y0K8
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

66 AVENUE ROAD SUITE 4
Toronto ON  M5R3N8
Canada
Phone: 4169222868
Fax: 4169222026
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

66 AVENUE ROAD SUITE 4
Toronto ON  M5R3N8
Canada
Phone: 4169222868
Fax: 4169222026
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 25 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DAVID COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 02 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1999 to 02 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2000 to 02 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001