Cohen, Richard David (CPSO#: 53079)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1989