Cohen, Sharon (CPSO#: 58734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: Cohen, Sharon Clenman (used until: 25 Apr 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone: (416) 386-9761
Fax: (416) 386-0458
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharon Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cohen ( CPSO# 55782 )
Dr. S. Cohen ( CPSO# 58734 )

Business Address:
Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 1990 to 19 Aug 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988