Cohen, Stephen Saul (CPSO#: 62308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 203
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 668-4571
Fax: (905) 668-4286
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen S. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2011

Dr. S. Cohen ( CPSO# 62308 )

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 203
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 668-4571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. STEPHEN SAUL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991