Cohen, Steven Ralph (CPSO#: 30478)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: C/O Alesa Cohen Suite 300 1333 Neilson Road Scarborough, Ontario M1B 4Y9
Date Received: 15 Dec 2010


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 373 Brooke Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5M 2L5
Date Received: 12 Jul 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2009