Cohen, Tracey (CPSO#: 75025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-2222
Fax: (416) 485-2276
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

205 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-9530
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tracey Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cohen ( CPSO# 75025 )

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-2222

Business Address:
205 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2E8
Phone Number: (416) 392-9530

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACEY COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003