Cohen, Trevor (CPSO#: 74429)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2000 to 28 Jan 2000
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2006