Cohn, Tony Albert (CPSO#: 43070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre For Addiction and Mental
Health Queen Street Division
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32573
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

57 Borden Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2M8
Canada
Phone: (416) 944-8955
Fax: (416) 944-9216
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cohn ( CPSO# 43070 )

Business Address:
Centre For Addiction and Mental
Health Queen Street Division
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONY ALBERT COHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1984