Cohodarevic, Tea (CPSO#: 67138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
3rd Floor - Spine Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521 - 41
Fax: 416-521-4146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tea Cohodarevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cohodarevic ( CPSO# 67138 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre-West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4129

Business Address:
Function and Pain Program
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
11th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEA COHODAREVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHODAREVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1998