Coire, Claire Isabelle (CPSO#: 54720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7297
Fax: (905) 848-8313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claire I. Coire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coire ( CPSO# 54720 )

Business Address:
Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7297

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE ISABELLE COIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988