Colangelo, Patrizia Connie (CPSO#: 63983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1465 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1Y7
Phone: (416) 534-1150
Fax: (416) 534-9630
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRIZIA CONNIE COLANGELO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLANGELO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1992