Colapinto, Edward Vincent (CPSO#: 50273)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001