Colapinto, Michael Nicholas (CPSO#: 82906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46521
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Colapinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Colapinto ( CPSO# 82906 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NICHOLAS COLAPINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLAPINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010