Colborne, Brian James (CPSO#: 63134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5507
Fax: (519) 752-0098
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES COLBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBORNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Aug 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1991