Colby, Joshua (CPSO#: 81002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-7771
Fax: (613) 471-1493
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joshua Colby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Colby ( CPSO# 81002 )

Business Address:
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-7771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA COLBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2007