Cole, Christopher Paul (CPSO#: 55804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cole Clinic
424 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone: (519) 690-2864
Fax: 519-690-1391
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1344 County Road 22
Suite 101
Emeryville ON  N0R 1C0
Canada
Phone: (519) 727-4247
Fax: 519-690-1391
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Cole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cole ( CPSO# 55804 )

Business Address:
424 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 690-2864

Business Address:
The Cole Clinic Inc.
101-1344 County Road 22
Emeryville ON  N0R 1C0
Phone Number: (519) 727-4247

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher Paul
            Cole, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cole to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CHRISTOPHER PAUL COLE
                                          ("Dr. Cole")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Cole, certificate of registration number 55804, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my practice at
                  the Cole Clinic.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I, Dr. Cole, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (3)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cole, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease to
                        perform blepharoplasty.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge that, should I seek to change my scope of
                        practice, I shall obtain written approval from the College before
                        doing so, and acknowledge that in order to obtain such approval, I
                        shall be required to enter into a further undertaking with the
                        College to facilitate my change in scope of practice.
                  
            (4)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cole, undertake to the College that, effective immediately,
                        I shall post a sign in the waiting rooms of any location where I
                        previously performed blepharoplasty, in a clearly visible location,
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A" that states:
                  
                              Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty.
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cole, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cole, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Cole, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (11)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cole, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (11)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty.
                  
                              Dr. Cole shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
                              "Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty. 
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Cole, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Paul Cole to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 18, 2017:

Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty.

Dr. Cole shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".