Cole, Clarence William (CPSO#: 50274)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1998