Cole, Donald Charles (CPSO#: 31128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dalla Lana School of Public Health
University of Toronto
155 College Street
Suite HS 584
Toronto ON  M5T 3M7
Phone: (416) 946-7870
Fax: (416) 978-8299
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD CHARLES COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 1978 to 07 Aug 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986