Cole, Mara (CPSO#: 84271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
90 Warren Road
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M4V 2S2
Phone: (416) 924-7171
Fax: (416) 923-9015
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Pediatric Diabetes
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7534
Fax: (905) 472-7535
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mara Cole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cole ( CPSO# 84271 )

Business Address:
90 Warren Road
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M4V 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 924-7171

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Markham Stoufville Hospital
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7534

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARA COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010