Cole, Wendy Anne (CPSO#: 50276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2249 Carling Avenue Suite 405
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone: (613) 721-1161
Fax: (613) 721-1611
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-4708
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Cole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cole ( CPSO# 50276 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Suite 405
2249 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone Number: (613) 721-1161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ANNE COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987