Coleman, Anna-Claire (CPSO#: 87875)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2008 to 28 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2008