Coleman, Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 72066)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 25 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 1999 to 31 May 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 May 2000