Coles, Nicole Adrienne (CPSO#: 95694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario
M5X 1X3
Toronto ON  M4V2B4
Phone: 416 813 7500
Fax: 416 813 6204
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE ADRIENNE COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015